EP0473403 - Record card on which visual data can be printed and erased [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states NCR CORPORATION World Headquarters Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Tsutomu 364-2, Kamaonomiya Odawara-Shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS LIMITED 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | [1995/02] |
Former [1994/44] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1992/10] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307860.6 | 28.08.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | JP19900224559 | 28.08.1990 Original published format: JP 22455990 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0473403 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0473403 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/08, B42D15/10, B41M5/36, G06K3/00 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
G06K19/08 (EP);
G06K1/126 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/10] | G06K3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/10] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungskarte, auf der visuell erkennbare Daten gedruckt oder ausgelöscht werden können | [1992/10] | English: | Record card on which visual data can be printed and erased | [1992/10] | French: | Carte d'enregistrement sur laquelle des données visuelles peuvent être imprimées ou effacées | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/09] | 28.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2080289 ; | [A]JP2057396 ; | [X]EP0345980 ; | [A]EP0344789 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 271 (M-983)(4214) 12 June 1990 & JP-A-2 080 289 ( DAINIPPON ) 20 March 1990, & JP2080289 A 19900320 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 228 (M-973)(4171) 15 May 1990 & JP-A-2 057 396 ( SONY ) 27 February 1990, & JP2057396 A 19900227 |