EP0473425 - Optical disc apparatus for optically processing information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasahara, Akihiro, c/o Intellectual Property Div. K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91307902.6 | 29.08.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | JP19900225360 | 29.08.1990 Original published format: JP 22536090 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0473425 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0473425 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473425 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/08, G11B33/08, G11B21/02 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
G11B7/22 (EP,US);
G11B7/00 (KR);
G11B7/08582 (EP,US);
G11B7/0932 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/10] | G11B7/08 | Designated contracting states | DE [1997/18] |
Former [1992/10] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Abspielgerät für optische Platten zur optischen Verarbeitung von Information | [1992/10] | English: | Optical disc apparatus for optically processing information | [1992/10] | French: | Appareil à disque optique pour traitement optique d'information | [1992/10] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 20.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0442443 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3839708 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0178719 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | Examination | EP0314200 |