EP0479438 - Electromagnetic radiation absorbing material employing doubly layered particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chamberlain, Craig S., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Connell, Glen, c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Tait, William C., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | [1995/48] |
Former [1992/15] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91308300.2 | 11.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | US19900591799 | 02.10.1990 Original published format: US 591799 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0479438 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0479438 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479438 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q17/00 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
H01Q17/002 (EP);
H01Q19/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/15] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetische Strahlung absorbierendes Material mit doppelt umhüllten Partikeln | [1992/15] | English: | Electromagnetic radiation absorbing material employing doubly layered particles | [1992/15] | French: | Matériau absorbant les ondes électromagnétiques à particules à double enrobage | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP1220899 [ ]; | US3721982 [ ] (WESCH L); | GB1411731 [ ] (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD, et al); | US4173018 [ ] (CONVERSE WILLIAM E [US], et al) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 539 (E-853), 30th November 1989; & JP-A-1 220 899 (KENICHI NODA) 04-09-1989, & JP1220899 A 00000000 | Examination | JP51122356 | EP0240809 | EP0374795 | GB893007 | GB1216071 | US2951247 | US3599210 | US4012738 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 30 (E-76)[1064], 29th March 1977; & JP-A-51 122 356 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 26-10-1976, & JP51122356 A 00000000 |