EP0480585 - Device for conveying printed circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON DEN-NETSU KEIKI CO., LTD. 27-1, Shimomaruko 2-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states NIHON DEN-NETSU KEIKI CO., LTD. 27-1, Shimomaruko 2-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo, Kenshi 3-5, Okura 1-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308346.5 | 12.09.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | JP19900268520 | 08.10.1990 Original published format: JP 26852090 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0480585 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0480585 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480585 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/00, B65G17/26 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
H05K13/0061 (EP,US);
B65G17/26 (EP,US);
B65G2201/02 (EP,US);
B65G2207/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/16] | H05K13/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/16] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Förderung von Leiterplatten | [1992/16] | English: | Device for conveying printed circuit board | [1992/16] | French: | Dispositif de transport de plaquettes à circuits imprimés | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 09.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.03.1996 | FR | 27.03.1996 | IT | 27.03.1996 | NL | 27.03.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 27.03.1996 | |
IT | 27.03.1996 | ||
NL | 27.03.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 27.03.1996 | |
IT | 27.03.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | BE | 27.03.1996 | |
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 27.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2148831 (USM CORP); | [AP]EP0393796 (SOLTEC BV [NL]); | [A]DE3540475 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0356265 (UNIVERSAL INSTRUMENTS CORP [US]); | [A]EP0308006 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AD]EP0317213 (NIPPON DENNETSU KEIKI KK [JP]) |