EP0476935 - New indol and indoline derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/13] | Pharmaceutical compounds | ||
[1995/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lilly Industries Limited Kingsclere Road Basingstoke Hants RG21 2XA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states LILLY INDUSTRIES LIMITED Kingsclere Road Basingstoke Hants RG21 2XA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilmore, Jeremy 31 Danebury Walk Paddock Hill, Frimley, Surrey / GB | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308365.5 | 12.09.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | GB19900020338 | 18.09.1990 Original published format: GB 9020338 | [1992/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0476935 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476935 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/08, A61K31/40 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/13] | Title | German: | Neue Indol- und Indolin-Verbindungen | [1992/13] | English: | New indol and indoline derivatives | [1995/30] | French: | Nouveaux composés indoliques ou indoliniques | [1992/13] |
Former [1992/13] | Pharmaceutical compounds | Examination procedure | 23.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 21.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.1993 | 30.09.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.11.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0159376 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]); | [A]EP0242167 (ICI AMERICA INC [US]) |