EP0478244 - Ink cartridge and ink jet apparatus usable with ink cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Kenichirou, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308605.4 | 20.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | JP19900253606 | 22.09.1990 Original published format: JP 25360690 | JP19910236188 | 17.09.1991 Original published format: JP 23618891 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0478244 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0478244 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0478244 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
B41J2/17526 (EP);
B41J2/17513 (EP);
B41J2/1752 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/14] | Title | German: | Tintenkassette und Farbstrahlvorrichtung zur Benutzung dieser Kassette | [1992/14] | English: | Ink cartridge and ink jet apparatus usable with ink cartridge | [1992/14] | French: | Cartouche à encre et appareil à jet d'encre l'utilisant | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 11.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 11.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Request for further processing for: | 27.01.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.1997 | Decision despatched | 20.06.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 04.07.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.1997 | BE | 13.08.1997 | CH | 13.08.1997 | DK | 13.08.1997 | ES | 13.08.1997 | GR | 13.08.1997 | LI | 13.08.1997 | NL | 13.08.1997 | LU | 30.09.1997 | SE | 13.11.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 13.08.1997 | |
BE | 13.08.1997 | ||
CH | 13.08.1997 | ||
DK | 13.08.1997 | ||
ES | 13.08.1997 | ||
GR | 13.08.1997 | ||
LI | 13.08.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 13.08.1997 | |
BE | 13.08.1997 | ||
CH | 13.08.1997 | ||
DK | 13.08.1997 | ||
GR | 13.08.1997 | ||
LI | 13.08.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 13.08.1997 | |
BE | 13.08.1997 | ||
DK | 13.08.1997 | ||
GR | 13.08.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
CH | 18.11.1997 | ||
LI | 18.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 13.08.1997 | |
BE | 13.08.1997 | ||
DK | 13.08.1997 | ||
GR | 13.08.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 13.08.1997 | |
BE | 13.08.1997 | ||
DK | 13.08.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | AT | 13.08.1997 | |
BE | 13.08.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.08.1997 | |
SE | 13.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1141750 ; | [YD]US4119034 (WAX FRANZ); | [AD]US4695824 (TAZAKI SHIGEMITSU [JP]); | [YP]EP0412459 (CANON KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 398 (M-866)(3746) 5 September 1989 & JP-A-1 141 750 ( CANON INC ) 2 June 1989, & JP1141750 A 19890602 |