EP0477030 - Magnetic head assembly suitable for servo tracking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwamatsu, Tadashi 9-14-201, Shiba-machi 1-chome, Saidaiji Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Okuda, Tohru 7-12, Hiramatsu 3-chome Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308612.0 | 20.09.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | JP19900252928 | 21.09.1990 Original published format: JP 25292890 | [1992/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0477030 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/584, G11B21/10 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
G11B5/5504 (EP);
G11B5/584 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/13] | Title | German: | Magnetkopfanordnung verwendbar für Servospureinstellung | [1992/13] | English: | Magnetic head assembly suitable for servo tracking | [1992/13] | French: | Assemblage avec tête magnétique à utiliser pour le servo-centrage | [1992/13] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/38] | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4363046 ; | [X]CH650610 ; | [A]EP0148999 |