EP0479495 - Automatic variable image shift for precut tabled sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelley, Timothy J. 5816 Farmington Town Line Rd Farmington, New York, 14425 / US | 02 /
Rowold, Alane H. 124 Vassar St. Rochester, New York, 14607 / US | 03 /
Barrett, Mike W. 3240 Winton Rd S., Apartment F22 Rochester, New York, 14623 / US | 04 /
Parsons, Carol P 124 Vassar St. Rochester, New York, 14607 / US | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1992/15] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91308827.4 | 27.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | US19900589762 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: US 589762 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0479495 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0479495 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479495 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/387 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
H04N1/3873 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/15] | Title | German: | Automatisch einstellbare Bildverschiebung für vorgeschnittene tabellierte Blätter | [1992/15] | English: | Automatic variable image shift for precut tabled sheets | [1992/15] | French: | Décalage d'images automatique et variable pour feuilles tabulées prétaillées | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60179886 ; | [A]JP60182271 ; | [AD]US4745441 (MARUTA SYUZI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3838934 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0320278 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0208324 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 030 (P-426)5 February 1986 & JP-A-60 179 886 ( FUJI XEROX ) 13 September 1985, & JP60179886 A 19850913 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 24 (E-377)30 January 1986 & JP-A-60 182 271 ( CANON ) 17 September 1985, & JP60182271 A 19850917 |