EP0480660 - Recording and/or reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nonaka, Akifumi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1992/16] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309180.7 | 07.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | JP19900271590 | 09.10.1990 Original published format: JP 27159090 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0480660 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0480660 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480660 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/675, G11B33/10 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
G11B33/121 (EP,US);
G11B15/02 (KR);
G11B15/67584 (EP,US);
G11B33/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/16] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und/oder Wiedergabegerät | [1992/16] | English: | Recording and/or reproducing apparatus | [1992/16] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et/ou de reproduction | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 25.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57109104 ; | JP57109104 [ ]; | [A]US4464694 (KONDO MAKOTO [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 203 (P-148)(1081) 14 October 1982 & JP-A-57 109 104 ( TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K. ) 7 July 1982, & JP57109104 A 19820707 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 203 (P-148)(1081) 14 October 1982 & JP-A-57 109 104 ( TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K. ) 7 July 1982, & JP57109104 A 19820707 |