EP0480679 - Pesticidal composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Masao 11-8-303, Sonehigashinocho-2-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | 02 /
Ohtsubo, Toshiro 20-10, Tomogaoka-2-chome Sanda-shi / JP | 03 /
Tsuda, Shigenori, Sanshite Katsurazaka Roiyaru Ichibankan 509, 5-1, Oe Kitakutsukakecho-1-chome Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto-shi / JP | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309215.1 | 08.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | JP19900274984 | 11.10.1990 Original published format: JP 27498490 | JP19910022899 | 22.01.1991 Original published format: JP 2289991 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480679 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480679 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/12, A01N25/14, A01N25/34 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
A01N25/14 (EP,US);
A01N25/12 (EP,US);
A01N25/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/16] | Title | German: | Pestizide Zusammensetzung | [1992/16] | English: | Pesticidal composition | [1992/16] | French: | Composition pesticide | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9000007 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]DE3017639 (NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE [DE]); | [A]FR2579464 (OREAL [FR]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 26, 25 June 1984, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 215536Y, 'Stable effervescent tablets' page 345 ; |