EP0482844 - GL-7ACA acylase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aramori, Ichiro Naka 1300-104 Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300 / JP | 02 /
Fukagawa, Masao Naka 1300-104 Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300 / JP | 03 /
Ono, Hiroki 2-1-7, Kikyougaokanishi Nabari-shi MIE 518-04 / JP | 04 /
Ishitani, Yosuke 7-4-13, Okamoto Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 659 / JP | 05 /
Tsumura, Mana 2-14, 912-304, Azuma Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 06 /
Iwami, Morita 2-8-1, Umezono Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 07 /
Kojo, Hitoshi 1160-7, Nagakuni Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300 / JP | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Gaunt, Robert John, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Gaunt, Robert John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309666.5 | 18.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | GB19900022907 | 22.10.1990 Original published format: GB 9022907 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0482844 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0482844 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482844 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N9/80, C12P35/02, C12N1/21 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
C12N9/80 (EP,US);
C12P35/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/18] | C12N15/55, C12N9/48, C12P35/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | GL-7ACA Acylase | [1992/18] | English: | GL-7ACA acylase | [1992/18] | French: | Acylase GL-7ACA | [1992/18] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 16.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 16.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 06.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60110292 ; | [A]WO9012110 (BIOPURE CORP [US]) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY vol. 163, no. 3, September 1985, pages 1222 - 1228 A. MATSUDA AND K-I. KOMATSU 'Molecular cloning and structure of the gene for 7-be ta-(4-carboxybutanamido)cephalosporanic acid acylase from a Pseudomonas strain' | [A] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY vol. 169, December 1987, WASHINGTON USA pages 5815 - 5820 A. MATSUDA ET AL 'Cloning and characterization of the genes for two distinct cephalosporin acylases from a Pseudomonas strain' | [A] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY vol. 169, December 1987, WASHINGTON USA pages 5821 - 5826 A. MATSUDA ET AL 'Nucleotide sequences of the genes for two distinct cephalosporin acylases from a Pseudomonas strain' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 254 (C-308)(1977) 11 October 1985 & JP-A-60 110 292 ( ASAHI KASEI KOGYO ) 15 June 1985, & JP60110292 A 19850615 | [XP] - JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION AND BIOENGINEERING vol. 72, no. 4, 1991, pages 227 - 231 I.ARAMORI ET AL 'Isolation of soil strains producing new cephalosporin acylases' |