EP0482845 - Digital-to-analog converting unit with improved linearity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawara, Takeshi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309667.3 | 18.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | JP19900288918 | 26.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28891890 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0482845 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0482845 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/74 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
H03M1/0651 (EP,US);
H03M1/685 (EP,US);
H03M1/747 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/18] | Title | German: | Digital-Analogwandler mit verbesserter Linearität | [1992/18] | English: | Digital-to-analog converting unit with improved linearity | [1992/18] | French: | Convertisseur numérique-analogique à linéarité améliorée | [1992/18] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 04.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 09.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/46] | 19.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02253719 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4; | DE3612693 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901225), vol. 014, no. 580, Database accession no. (E - 1017) [ ] * abstract * | [A] - Miki T et al, "An 80 MHz 8 b CMOS D/A converter", 1986 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS (CAT. NO.86CH2263-2), ANAHEIM, CA, USA, 19-21 FEB. 1986, 132 - 133, 325 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |