EP0482861 - Hemostatic clip cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pilling Weck Incorporated One Weck Drive P.O. Box 12600 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states Pilling Weck Incorporated One Weck Drive P.O. Box 12600 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709 / US | ||
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states EDWARD WECK INC. Weck Drive P.O. Box 12600 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709 / US | ||
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states EDWARD WECK INCORPORATED One Weck Drive, P.O.Box 12600 Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Warren 1210 Oxford Place Cary, North Carolina 27511 / US | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1995/49] |
Former [1992/18] | Cook, Anthony John D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309705.1 | 21.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | US19900601833 | 22.10.1990 Original published format: US 601833 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482861 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482861 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61B17/122 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/1222 (EP,US);
A61B17/08 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1992/18] | A61B17/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | Patrone für hämostatische Klammern | [1992/18] | English: | Hemostatic clip cartridge | [1992/18] | French: | Cartouche pour clips hémostatiques | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.1997 | DK | 05.03.1997 | GR | 05.03.1997 | NL | 05.03.1997 | SE | 05.06.1997 | LU | 21.10.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 05.03.1997 | |
DK | 05.03.1997 | ||
GR | 05.03.1997 | ||
NL | 05.03.1997 | ||
SE | 05.06.1997 | ||
LU | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 05.03.1997 | |
DK | 05.03.1997 | ||
GR | 05.03.1997 | ||
SE | 05.06.1997 | ||
LU | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 05.03.1997 | |
DK | 05.03.1997 | ||
SE | 05.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 05.03.1997 | |
SE | 05.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 05.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3270745 (CHARLE WOOD ERNEST); | [XD]US4076120 (CARROLL RONALD L, et al); | [A]GB2103565 (ETHICON INC [US]); | [X]US4961499 (KULP RODNEY [US]) |