EP0484103 - Gaming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROJECT DESIGN TECHNOLOGY LTD. Unit 51, Langley Mill Industrial Estate, Wesley Street Langley Mill Nottingham NG16 4BE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states PROJECT DESIGN TECHNOLOGY LTD. Unit 51, Langley Mill Industrial Estate, Wesley Street Langley Mill, Nottingham NG16 4BE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ludlow, Roy Arthur George, Proj. Design Tech. Ltd. Unit 51, Langley Mill Ind. Estate, Wesley Street Langley Mill, Nottingham, NG16 4BE / GB | 02 /
De Beneducci, Ramon, Proj. Design Tech. Ltd. Unit 51, Langley Mill Ind. Estate, Wesley Street Langley Mill, Nottingham, NG16 4BE / GB | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Drever, Ronald Fergus Swindell & Pearson 48, Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [1993/19] |
Former [1992/19] | Drever, Ronald Fergus Swindell & Pearson 48, Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 91309977.6 | 29.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | GB19900023629 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: GB 9023629 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0484103 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0484103 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/34 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
G07F17/3211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | Spielautomat | [1992/19] | English: | Gaming apparatus | [1992/19] | French: | Machine de jeu | [1992/19] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/49] | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.1991 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   18.12.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3642287 (LALLY JOSEPH E, et al); | [A]GB1464896 (BALLY MFG CORP); | [A]DE3105266 (GAUSELMANN PAUL) |