EP0539637 - Simultaneously operative multi-unit AC or DC series excitation motors or compound motors interlock driving circuit device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her PO Box 84-85 Taipei / TW | [1993/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/18] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyers Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310107.7 | 01.11.1991 | [1993/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0539637 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0539637 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/46 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
H02P5/00 (EP);
H02P6/04 (US);
H02P8/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/18] | Title | German: | Mehrere gleichzeitig und wahlweise mit Gleich- oder Wechselstrom betriebene Motoren mit Verbund- oder Reihenschluss-Erregerwicklungen und Schaltungsvorrichtung zur Synchronisationssteuerung | [1993/18] | English: | Simultaneously operative multi-unit AC or DC series excitation motors or compound motors interlock driving circuit device | [1993/18] | French: | Multiples moteurs compounds ou moteurs à excitations séries à courant continu ou alternatif fonctionnant simultanément et dispositif à circuit de commande de synchronisation | [1993/18] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 03.04.1996 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1400998 ; | [A]FR749458 (DEUTSCHE TELEPHONWERK KABEL) | [X] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED Section PQ, Week 8849, 25 January 1989 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class Q36, AN 352927 & SU-A-1 400 998 (SMOLENSK MOSC POWER) 7 June 1988, & SU1400998 A 00000000 |