EP0486191 - Continuously variable traction drive with no contact spin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc. 6700 18 1/2 Mile Road P.O. Box 8022 Sterling Heights MI 48311-8022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states BORG-WARNER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. 6700 18 1/2 Mile Road, P.O. Box 8022 Sterling Heights, Michigan 48311-8022 / US | ||
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states BORG-WARNER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. 6700 18 1/2 Mile Road P.O.Box 8022 Sterling Heights, Michigan 48311-8022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durum, Metin M. 3 N. 417 Jill Court Elmhurst, Illinois 60126 / US | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310153.1 | 04.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | US19900612632 | 13.11.1990 Original published format: US 612632 | US19910685851 | 16.04.1991 Original published format: US 685851 | [1992/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486191 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/18, F16H15/32, F16H15/44 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
F16H15/32 (EP);
F16H15/18 (EP);
F16H15/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/21] | Title | German: | Stufenloses Reibungsgetriebe ohne Kontaktschwenkung | [1992/21] | English: | Continuously variable traction drive with no contact spin | [1992/21] | French: | Variateur continue de vitesse à friction sans pivotement de contact | [1992/21] | File destroyed: | 17.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/30] | 26.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1003009 ; | [X]DE1234118 ; | [X]AU456532 ; | [A]US1856383 |