EP0485140 - Reusable cartridge for storing and dispensing light sensitive web material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wyman, Stuart J., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91310174.7 | 04.11.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | US19900609376 | 05.11.1990 Original published format: US 609376 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0485140 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0485140 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/58 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
G03B27/588 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/20] | Title | German: | Wiederverwendbare Kassette zur Lagerung und Abnahme von lichtempfindlichen Bandmaterial | [1992/20] | English: | Reusable cartridge for storing and dispensing light sensitive web material | [1992/20] | French: | Cassette réutilisable pour le stockage et la distribution de matériel photosensible en forme de bande | [1992/20] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/47] | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2154356 (LINOTYPE GMBH); | [A]DE2246320 (AGFA GEVAERT AG); | [A]US4956908 (MORSE MARK J [US], et al); | [A]EP0196577 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US3565526 (GEMEREN DIRK A VAN) |