EP0486199 - Wastewater treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE COMMONWEALTH INDUSTRIAL GASES LIMITED 500 Pacific Highway St. Leonards, NSW 2065 / AU | [1992/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Brian Jordayne 36 Ashburn Place Gladesville NSW 2111 / AU | 02 /
Ogston, Mervyn Ross 1688 Ipswich Road Rocklea Queensland 4106 / AU | 03 /
Wickens, Denys 74 5th Street Flagtown New Jersey 08821 / US | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Wickham, Michael c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310176.2 | 04.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | AU19900003149 | 02.11.1990 Original published format: AU 314990 | [1992/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486199 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/26, C02F3/30 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
C02F3/006 (EP);
C02F3/26 (EP);
C02F3/28 (EP);
C02F3/30 (EP);
C02F3/308 (EP);
C02F2209/02 (EP);
C02F2209/06 (EP);
C02F2209/08 (EP);
C02F2209/10 (EP);
C02F2209/22 (EP);
C02F2209/40 (EP);
C02F2209/44 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/33] |
Former [1992/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Abwasserbehandlung | [1992/21] | English: | Wastewater treatment | [1992/21] | French: | Traitement de l'eau usée | [1992/21] | File destroyed: | 22.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, LU, SE | 21.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/30] | 02.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.01.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.12.1992 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0108730 (RIGHETTI GIANMARIA); | [A]GB1417573 (BOC INTERNATIONAL LTD); | [A]EP0053396 (LINDE AG [DE]) |