EP0485143 - Liposomal compositions and processes for their production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUTO NACIONAL DE ENGENHARIA E TECNOLOGIA INDUSTRIAL Estrada do Paco do Lumiar 1699 Lisboa Codex / PT | [1997/51] |
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states INSTITUTO NACIONAL DE ENGENHARIA E TECNOLOGIA INDUSTRIAL Estrada do Paco do Lumiar 1699 Lisboa Codex / PT | ||
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states LABORATORIO NACIONAL DE ENGENHARIA E TECNOLOGIA INDUSTRIAL Azinhaga dos Lameiros a Estrada do Paco do Lumiar P-1966 Lisboa Codex / PT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meirinhos da Cruz, Maria Eugenia Rua Maestro Raul Ferrao 43 P-1500 Lisboa / PT | 02 /
Santana Jorge, Joao Carlos Rua Bernardo Santareno, Lote C-22-6oC, Miratejo P-2880 Almada / PT | 03 /
Figueria Martins, Maria Barbara dos Anjos Rua Luis Pedrosa de Barros, 2-2o-A. P1400 Lisboa / PT | 04 /
Guilherme Gaspar, Maria Manuela de Jesus Praca Dr. Ernesto Roma 8-3oA P-1900 Lisboa / PT | 05 /
Esteves Simoes, Aida da Conceicao Rua da Quinta das Palmeiras, 100r/c Esq. P-2780 Oeiras / PT | 06 /
Perez-Soler, Roman 2904 Rice Boulevard Houston, Texas 77005 / US | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310180.4 | 04.11.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | PT19120000958 | 06.11.1990 Original published format: PT 95812 | PT19370000960 | 28.11.1990 Original published format: PT 96037 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485143 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485143 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K38/46 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
A61K38/50 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP);
A61K9/1277 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/20] | A61K9/127, A61K37/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | Liposomale Mittel sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1992/20] | English: | Liposomal compositions and processes for their production | [1992/20] | French: | Compositions liposomales et leurs procédés de préparation | [1992/20] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 24.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.1997 | BE | 17.12.1997 | DK | 17.12.1997 | GR | 17.12.1997 | NL | 17.12.1997 | SE | 17.03.1998 | [2015/21] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 17.12.1997 | |
BE | 17.12.1997 | ||
GR | 17.12.1997 | ||
NL | 17.12.1997 | ||
SE | 17.03.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 17.12.1997 | |
BE | 17.12.1997 | ||
GR | 17.12.1997 | ||
SE | 17.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 17.12.1997 | |
BE | 17.12.1997 | ||
SE | 17.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 17.12.1997 | |
SE | 17.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | SE | 17.03.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5782311 ; | [A]US4933121 (LAW SAY-JONG [US], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 165 (C-121)[1043], 28th August 1982; & JP-A-57 82 311 (TANABE SEIYAKU K.K.) 22-05-1982, & JP5782311 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., vol. 32, no. 6, June 1984, pages 2442-2445; T. OHSAWA et al.: "A novel method for preparing liposome with a high capacity to encapsulate proteinous drugs: freeze-drying method" | [Y] - JOURNAL OF MICROENCAPSULATION, vol. 7, no. 4, October/December 1990, pages 497-503; S.F. ALINO et al.: "High encapsulation efficiencies in sized liposomes produced by extrusion of dehydration-rehydration vesicles" |