EP0485209 - Non A, non B hepatitis virus related antigen, antibody detection systems, polynucleotides and polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMMUNO JAPAN INC. 4-28-14-701, Ogikubo Suginami-Ku Tokyo 167 / JP | [1992/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Hiroaki 3132-24, Yakushi Ji, Minami Kawachi Machi Kawachi-Gun, Tochigi-Ken / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Tetsuo 4-28-14-701 Ogikubo Suginami-ku, Tokyo 167 / JP | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers 4 Dyers Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310297.6 | 07.11.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | JP19900304405 | 08.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30440590 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485209 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0485209 | Date: | 27.11.1992 | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/40, C12Q1/70, C07K15/00, G01N33/576 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP);
C12N2770/24222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/20] | Title | German: | Mit Non-A Non-B Hepatitis Virus verwandtes Antigen, Aufspürsysteme für Antikörper, Polynukleotide und Polypeptide | [1992/20] | English: | Non A, non B hepatitis virus related antigen, antibody detection systems, polynucleotides and polypeptides | [1992/20] | French: | Antigène relatif au virus de l'hépatite non-A non-B, systèmes de détection d'anticorps, polynucléotides et polypeptides | [1992/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 07.06.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0318216 (CHIRON CORP [US]); | [X]EP0388232 (CHIRON CORP [US]); | [XP]EP0419182 (OYA AKIRA DR DIRECTOR GENERAL [JP], et al); | [XP]GB2239245 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [XP]EP0445423 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) | [X] - JAPAN JOURNAL EXPERIMENTAL MEDECINE vol. 60, no. 3, 1990, JAPAN pages 167 - 177; H. OKAMOTO ET AL.: 'The 5'-terminal sequence of the hepatitis C virus genome' | [X] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. vol. 18, no. 15, 1990, LONDON, GB page 4626; K. TAKEUCHI ET AL.: 'Nucleotide sequence of core and envelope genes of the hepatitis C virus genome derived directly from human healthy carriers' | [XP] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA. vol. 88, no. 8, April 1991, WASHINGTON US pages 3392 - 3396; N. OGATA ET AL.: 'Nucleotide sequence and mutation rate of the H strain of hepatitis C virus' |