EP0486222 - Improvements in and relating to microprocessor based systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Brueton House, New Road Solihull West Midlands B91 3TX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Brueton House, New Road Solihull, West Midlands B91 3TX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phoenix, John Bernard 92 Leopold Avenue Birmingham B20 1ET / GB | 02 /
Vincent, Kenneth 1 Barlich Way Alcester B49 6QE / GB | 03 /
Hurst, David Charles 6 Langfield Road, Knowle Solihull, West Midlands B93 9PN / GB | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310339.6 | 08.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | GB19900024488 | 10.11.1990 Original published format: GB 9024488 | [1992/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0486222 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0486222 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486222 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/24 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
G06F11/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | Verbesserung in mikroprozessorbetriebenen Systemen | [1998/03] | English: | Improvements in and relating to microprocessor based systems | [1992/21] | French: | Améliorations de systèmes à base de microprocesseur | [1992/21] |
Former [1992/21] | Verbesserung in mikroprozessorbetriebenen Systeme( | Examination procedure | 23.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2030334 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | [A]GB2183411 (ML ENG PLYMOUTH); | [A]US4811200 (WAGNER DAVID J [US], et al); | [XP]FR2658335 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |