EP0494495 - Forming a metal-oxide coating on glass articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1996 [1996/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | ||
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-1303 / US | ||
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. (a Pennsylvania corp.) Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindner, Georg Heinrich Haydnlaan 10 NL-4384 KV Vlissingen / NL | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310433.7 | 12.11.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | US19910638854 | 08.01.1991 Original published format: US 638854 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494495 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494495 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/245 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
C03C17/005 (EP,US);
C03C17/06 (KR);
C03C17/245 (EP,US);
C03C2217/211 (EP,US);
C03C2217/212 (EP,US);
C03C2218/152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/29] | Title | German: | Metalloxidbeschichtung von Glasgegenständen | [1992/29] | English: | Forming a metal-oxide coating on glass articles | [1992/29] | French: | Revêtement d'articles en verre avec un oxyde métallique | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2069475 (OWENS ILLINOIS INC); | [A]US4425868 (SHAPIRO RICHARD G [US]); | [A]US4615916 (HENDERSON HENRY N [US]); | [A]US4879970 (BARKALOW RAYMOND W [US], et al) |