EP0497043 - Sealing device for reversibly blocking the bore of a pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1996 [1996/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Gas plc Rivermill House, 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1 3JL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states British Gas plc Rivermill House, 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1V 3JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ashcroft, Ian 34 Coombe Wood Hill Purley, Surrey / GB | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Morgan, David James BG plc Intellectual Property Department 100 Thames Valley Park Drive Reading Berkshire RG6 1PT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Morgan, David James British Gas plc, Intellectual Property Department, 59 Bryanston Street London W1A 2AZ / GB | ||
Former [1992/32] | Morgan, David James British Gas plc, Intellectual Property Department, 59 Bryanston Street London W1A 2AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310716.5 | 20.11.1991 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | GB19910001853 | 29.01.1991 Original published format: GB 9101853 | [1992/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497043 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497043 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/11 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
F16L55/1141 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0318 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/32] | Title | German: | Dichtungsanordnung zum umkehrbaren Absperren eines Rohrdurchlasses | [1992/32] | English: | Sealing device for reversibly blocking the bore of a pipe | [1992/32] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité pour fermer réversiblement l'ouverture d'un conduit | [1992/32] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1011293 (MUELLER BRASS CO); | [A]US3358869 (PALMER EARL W, et al); | [X]US4531550 (GARTNER KARL [DE]) | Examination | US928969 | US2107259 | US4462430 |