EP0488599 - Tape cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwano, Kenji 32-4, Obara Tsuyama-shi / JP | 02 /
Shiomi, Yoshinori 626-12, Yamakita, Tsuyama-shi Okayama-ken, 708 / JP | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91310779.3 | 22.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | JP19900338081 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: JP 33808190 | JP19900338083 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: JP 33808390 | JP19910049514 | 14.03.1991 Original published format: JP 4951491 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0488599 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0488599 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0488599 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/087 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
G11B23/08728 (EP,US);
G11B23/087 (KR);
G11B23/08735 (EP,US);
G11B23/08714 (EP,US);
G11B23/08785 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/23] | Title | German: | Bandkassette | [1992/23] | English: | Tape cassette | [1992/23] | French: | Cassette à bande | [1992/23] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/29: (deleted) | EPB 1997/29: (deleted) | EPB 1997/29: (deleted) | EPB 1997/14: Teilanmeldung 96120957.4 eingereicht am 27/12/96 | EPB 1997/14: Divisional application 96120957.4 filed on 27/12/96 | EPB 1997/14: Demande divisionnaire 96120957.4 déposée le 27/12/96 | Examination procedure | 08.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 19.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96120957.4 / EP0773546 | EP96120958.2 / EP0773547 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61233484 ; | [X]JP62028988 ; | EP0384786 [ ] (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | EP0153585 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 72 (P-554)5 March 1987 & JP-A-61 233 484 ( MATSUSHITA ) 17 October 1986, & JP61233484 A 19861017 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 208 (P-593)7 July 1987 & JP-A-62 028 988 ( SONY ) 6 February 1987, & JP62028988 A 19870206 | Examination | EP0090573 | EP0139181 | EP0150987 | EP0152693 | EP0189989 | EP0344901 | FR2537762 | FR2568398 | FR2640071 | GB2016413 | GB2016415 | US4012011 | US4716745 | US4840326 |