EP0490535 - Transistor with inverse silicide T-gate structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1992/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Min-Liang 1545 Promise Lane Allentown, Pennsylvania 18106 / US | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311048.2 | 28.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | US19900624785 | 07.12.1990 Original published format: US 624785 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0490535 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0490535 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490535 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/772 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
H01L29/66598 (EP,US);
H01L21/823835 (EP,US);
H01L29/42376 (EP,US);
H01L29/6659 (EP,US);
H01L27/0928 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/25] | H01L29/784 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/25] | Title | German: | Feldeffekttransistor mit inverser T-förmiger Silizid-Torelektrode | [1992/25] | English: | Transistor with inverse silicide T-gate structure | [1992/25] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ avec électrode inverse siliciée en forme de T | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0422901 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0377084 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0387722 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |