EP0488771 - Arbitration of packet switched busses, including busses for shared memory multiprocessors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sindhu, Pradeep S. 1557 Montalto Street Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
Frailong, Jean-Marc 408 Pepper Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
Gastinel, Jean A. 47 Starlite Court Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Mackett, Margaret, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Phillips, Margaret Dawn, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1992/23] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311093.8 | 29.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | US19900621123 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: US 621123 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0488771 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0488771 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0488771 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/364, G06F13/18 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
G06F13/364 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/23] | Title | German: | Arbitrierung von paketvermittelten Bussen, einschliesslich Bussen von Multiprozessoren mit gemeinsam genutztem Speicher | [1992/23] | English: | Arbitration of packet switched busses, including busses for shared memory multiprocessors | [1992/23] | French: | Arbitrage de bus à commutation de paquets, comprenant des bus de multiprocesseurs à mémoire portagée | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0138717 (CHOMEL DENIS [FR], et al) | [A] - IEEE MICRO. vol. 5, no. 4, August 1985, NEW YORK US pages 5 - 17; J. ROSE ET AL.: 'Fermtor: a tunable multiprocessor architecture' |