EP0497049 - Time-shared scanning keyboard interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE 195, Sec. 4, Chung-Hsin Road Chutung Hsinchu 31015 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE 195, Sec. 4, Chung-Hsin Road Chutung, Hsinchu 31015 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Huei-Ming No.16, Alley 2, Lane 116, North Park Road Tainan, Taiwan / CN | 02 /
Chen, Yang-Chern No.1, Ai-Ming Street Long-San Li, Hsain Chu, Taiwan / CN | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311299.1 | 04.12.1991 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | US19910646943 | 29.01.1991 Original published format: US 646943 | [1992/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497049 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497049 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03M11/00 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
H03M11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB [1992/41] |
Former [1992/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Tastaturschnittstelle mit Zeitteilung | [1992/32] | English: | Time-shared scanning keyboard interface | [1992/32] | French: | Interface à temps partagé pour clavier | [1992/32] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, DK, ES, GR, IT, LU, NL, SE | 29.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 31.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.03.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.1992 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.1992 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.09.1996 | BE | 04.09.1996 | FR | 04.09.1996 | DE | 05.12.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1997/32] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
DE | 05.12.1996 | ||
FR | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
DE | 05.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | BE | 04.09.1996 | |
DE | 05.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | DE | 05.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59069828 ; | [X]EP0094130 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al); | [A]US4583092 (SAITO TOMOTAKA [JP]); | [A]US4673933 (BAUER JERRY R [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 175 (P-294)(1612) 11 August 1984 & JP-A-59 069 828 ( MATSUSHITA ) 20 April 1984, & JP59069828 A 19840420 |