EP0493911 - Method of and apparatus for controlling wheel spin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Brueton House, New Road Solihull West Midlands B91 3TX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Brueton House, New Road Solihull, West Midlands B91 3TX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glover, Douglas William 69, Foxcote Close, Winyates East Redditch, Worcestershire, B98 0PS / GB | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Robinson, John Stuart, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway, Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Robinson, John Stuart, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham, B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311547.3 | 11.12.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | GB19910000165 | 04.01.1991 Original published format: GB 9100165 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493911 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493911 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493911 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60K28/16 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
B60K28/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Steuerung des Durchdrehens der Räder | [1992/28] | English: | Method of and apparatus for controlling wheel spin | [1992/28] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour commander le patinage des roues | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 09.11.1995 | [1996/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60191827 ; | [X]GB2100886 (VOLVO AB [SE]); | [X]US4771850 (MATSUDA TOSHIRO [JP]); | [X]EP0283453 (AUTOLIV CIPRO AB [SE]); | [AP]US5025881 (POIRIER DAVID C [US], et al); | [XPD]EP0443785 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]); | [AP]EP0444803 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 37 (M-453)(2094) 12 February 1986 & JP-A-60 191 827 ( NIPPON DENSO K.K. ) 30 September 1985, & JP60191827 A 19850930 |