EP0490667 - HIV protease inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states NIPPON MINING COMPANY LIMITED 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mimoto, Tsutomu, c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Naoko, c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Nagano, Yuuichi, c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Shintani, Makoto, c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Kiso, Yoshiaki 15-26 Inaba-cho, Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [1992/39] |
Former [1992/25] | 01 /
Mimoto, Tsutomu, c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | ||
02 /
Hattori, Naoko, c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
Nagano, Yuuichi, c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
04 /
Shintani, Makoto, c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
05 /
Kiso, Yoshiaki, c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi, Saitama / JP | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Geering, Keith Edwin REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311549.9 | 11.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | JP19900409673 | 11.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40967390 | JP19910025755 | 25.01.1991 Original published format: JP 2575591 | JP19910089976 | 28.03.1991 Original published format: JP 8997691 | JP19910169174 | 14.06.1991 Original published format: JP 16917491 | JP19910304043 | 23.10.1991 Original published format: JP 30404391 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0490667 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0490667 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490667 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/02, C07K7/02, A61K38/04 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
C07K7/02 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07K5/0202 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/25] | C07K5/02, C07K7/02, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | HIV-Proteaseinhibitoren | [1992/25] | English: | HIV protease inhibitors | [1992/25] | French: | Inhibiteurs d'HIV protéase | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Request for further processing for: | 17.12.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.01.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 20, no. 4, 1977, WASHINGTON, USA pages 510 - 515 TAKITA ET AL 'Synthesis and structure-activity relationships of bestatin analogues, inhibitors of aminopeptidase B' | [X] - CHEM. PHARM. BULL vol. 38, no. 9, 1990, TOKYO, JAPAN pages 2487 - 2493 IIZUKA ET AL 'Synthesis and structure-activity relationships of human renin inhibitors designed from angiotensinogen transition state' | [X] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY vol. 45, no. 12, 1980, EASTON, USA pages 2288 - 2290 RICH ET AL 'Synthesis of (2S,3R)-3-amino-2 -hydroxy-5-methylhexanoic acid derivatives: Application to the synthesis of amastatin, an inhibitor of aminopeptidases' | [A] - SCIENCE vol. 248, April 1990, LANCASTER, USA pages 358 - 361 ROBERTS ET AL 'Rational design of peptide-based HIV proteinase inhibitors' | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 1990, pages 2707 - 2714 IIZUKA ET AL 'Orally potent human renin inhibitors derived from angiotensinogen transition state: Design, synthesis and mode of interaction' | [XP] - CHEM. PHARM. BULL. vol. 39, no. 9, September 1991, TOKYO, JAPAN pages 2465 - 2467 MIMOTO ET AL 'Rational design and synthesis of a novel class of active site-targeted HIV protease inhibitors containing a hydroxymethylcarbonyl isostere. Use of phenylnorstatine or allophenylnorstatine as a transition-state mimic' | [XP] - CHEM. PHARM. BULL vol. 39, no. 11, November 1991, TOKYO, JAPAN pages 3088 - 3090 MIMOTO ET AL 'KNI-102, A novel tripeptide HIV protease inhibitor containing allophenylnorstatine as a transition-state mimic' | Examination | - CHEMICAL PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, Vol. 39, no. 11, November 1991, Tokyo (JP); MIMOTO ET AL., pp. 3000 - 3090 |