EP0490706 - Fibrid reinforced elastomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atkinson, Dexter Lee 10 Hayes Court Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | 02 /
Frances, Arnold 1400 Arron Circle Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 03 /
Hesler, Lee James 8217 Surreywood Drive Richmond, Virginia 23235 / US | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311643.0 | 13.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | US19900629657 | 14.12.1990 Original published format: US 629657 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0490706 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0490706 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490706 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/04, C08L21/00 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/046 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
C08L9/06 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K7/02 (EP,US);
C08L11/00 (EP,US);
C08L2205/16 (EP,US);
C08L33/20 (EP,US);
C08L77/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L2666/08 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/20 (US,EP);
C08L23/16, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/16, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/16, C08L2666/20 (EP,US);
C08L7/00, C08L2666/08 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Mit Fibrillen verstärkte Elastomere | [1992/25] | English: | Fibrid reinforced elastomers | [1992/25] | French: | Elastomères renforcés par fibrides | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 23.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4309531 (KYRITSOS JOSEPH, et al); | [X]EP0142795 (BASF AG [DE]); | [XD]US2999788 (WINTHROP MORGAN PAUL); | [AD]US4514541 (FRANCES ARNOLD [US]) | Examination | US4871004 |