EP0492933 - Multichip module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nCHIP, INC. 1971 North Capitol Avenue San Jose California 95132 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states nCHIP, INC. 1971 North Capitol Avenue San Jose, California 95132 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tuckerman, David B 6814 Amador Valley Boulevard Dublin California 94568 / US | 02 /
Mhasker, Pandharinath A 1438 Goldenlake Road San Jose California 95131 / US | 03 /
Benson, Donald 1075-129 Space Park Way Mountain View California 94043 / US | 04 /
Bobra, Yogendra 5499 Blackoak Way SanJose California 95129 / US | 05 /
Lang, Charles R 56 Holmes Drive San Jose California 95127 / US | 06 /
Thalapeneni, Garunada N 4652 Delores Court Union City California 94587 / US | 07 /
Schoenholtz, Joseph Jr 254 College Avenue Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 08 /
McWilliams, Bruce M 435 Del Sol Avenue Pleasanton California 94566 / US | 09 /
Brathwaite, Nicholas E 677 Dartmoor Lane 249 Hayward California 94544 / US | [1992/46] |
Former [1992/27] | 01 /
Tuckerman, David B 6814 Amador Valley Boulevard Dublin California 94568 / US | ||
02 /
Mhasker, Pandharinath A 1438 Goldenlake Road San Jose California 95131 / US | |||
03 /
Benson, Donald 1075-129 Space Park Way Mountain View California 94043 / US | |||
04 /
Bobra, Yogendra 5499 Blackoak Way SanJose California 95129 / US | |||
05 /
Lang, Charles R 56 Holmes Drive San Jose California 95127 / US | |||
06 /
Thalapeneni, Garunada N 4652 Delores Court Union City California 94587 / US | |||
07 /
Schoenholtz, Joseph Jr 254 College Avenue Palo Alto California 94306 / US | |||
08 /
McWilliams, Bruce M 435 Del Sol Avenue Pleasanton California 94566 / US | |||
09 /
Brathwaite, Nicholas E 715 Heathcourt *190 Hayward California 94544 / US | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/27] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311696.8 | 17.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | US19900629746 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: US 629746 | US19900630469 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: US 630469 | US19900629851 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: US 629851 | US19900629731 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: US 629731 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0492933 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0492933 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/64, H01L25/065 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
H01L24/85 (EP);
H01L23/642 (EP);
H01L24/78 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/48228 (EP);
H01L2224/48472 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2224/78 (EP);
H01L2224/85148 (EP);
H01L2224/92247 (EP);
H01L24/48 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/01005 (EP);
H01L2924/01006 (EP);
H01L2924/01013 (EP);
H01L2924/01014 (EP);
H01L2924/01019 (EP);
H01L2924/01023 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/01032 (EP);
H01L2924/01033 (EP);
H01L2924/01042 (EP);
H01L2924/01047 (EP);
H01L2924/01061 (EP);
H01L2924/01073 (EP);
H01L2924/01074 (EP);
H01L2924/01076 (EP);
H01L2924/01079 (EP);
H01L2924/01082 (EP);
H01L2924/10329 (EP);
H01L2924/14 (EP);
H01L2924/15312 (EP);
H01L2924/1532 (EP);
H01L2924/19041 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/78 (EP); |
Former IPC [1992/27] | H01L23/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/27] | Title | German: | Mehrchipmodul | [1992/27] | English: | Multichip module | [1992/27] | French: | Module multi-puce | [1992/27] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/43] | 14.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/40] | 31.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57128951 ; | [A]DD281076 (ROBOTRON VEB K [DD]) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 4, September 1976, page 1188, New York, US; O.R. ABOLAFIA et al.: "Forming decoupling capacitors on a substrate" | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 62, no. 26 (E-141), 11th November 1982; & JP-A-57 128 951 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 10-08-1982, & JP57128951 A 00000000 | [A] - IEEE 1987 SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 30th February 1987, pages 224-224, New York, US; H.J. LEVINSTEIN et al.: "Multi-chip packaging technology for VLSI-based systems" |