EP0492988 - Toilet and sewage disposal apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/27] | Raw sewage disposal apparatus and prefab for accomodating the same | ||
[1996/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKKEN CORPORATION 14-2, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states NIKKEN CORPORATION 14-2, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chuiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states JAPANIC CORPORATION Minamimachi 3704 Ashikaga-shi Tochigi-ken 326 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishi, Mitsuhiro, c/o Japanic Corporation Minamimachi 3704, Ashikaga-shi Tochigi-ken 326 / JP | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Shindler, Nigel, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Shindler, Nigel, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | ||
Former [1994/08] | Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | ||
Former [1992/27] | Shindler, Nigel Batchellor, Kirk & Co. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311806.3 | 19.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | JP19900412559 | 21.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41255990 | JP19910152492 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15249291 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0492988 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0492988 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0492988 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E03D13/00, E03D11/11, E04H1/12, E06C9/02 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
E04H1/1216 (EP,US);
C02F11/00 (KR);
E03D11/11 (EP,US);
E06C9/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/27] | E03D13/00, E03D11/11 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/27] | Title | German: | Toilette und Entsorgungsvorrichtung für Klärschlämme | [1996/47] | English: | Toilet and sewage disposal apparatus therefor | [1996/47] | French: | Cabinet et dispositif d'évacuation des eaux d'égouts | [1996/47] |
Former [1992/27] | Entsorgungsvorrichtung für Klärschlämme und vorgefertigtes Gefüge für deren Aufstellung | ||
Former [1992/27] | Raw sewage disposal apparatus and prefab for accomodating the same | ||
Former [1992/27] | Dispositif d'évacuation des boues et structure préfabriquée pour son installation | Examination procedure | 29.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 13.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.12.1996 | GB | 20.02.1997 | DE | 21.02.1997 | [2008/40] |
Former [1998/05] | GB | 20.02.1997 | |
DE | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | DE | 21.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3745592 (NOVAK L); | [A]FR2286922 (MONOGRAM IND INC [US]); | [A]DE2450331 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [A]US4137579 (SOLER PETER S); | [A]US4478001 (HOGAN TANAI N [US], et al); | [A]EP0313673 (MULLER HARALD GEORG); | [AD]EP0343817 (HIKOMA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0363012 (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]) |