EP0493058 - Method and apparatus for supplying ink to an ink jet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlotta, Michael 7048 Old Ridge Road Sodus, New York 14551 / US | 02 /
Dietl, Steven J. 163 Haley Road Ontario, New York 14519 / US | 03 /
Morano, Richard A. 3984 Pilgrim Port Road Lyons, New York 14489 / US | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Mackett, Margaret, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Phillips, Margaret Dawn, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1992/27] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311925.1 | 23.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | US19900634585 | 27.12.1990 Original published format: US 634585 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493058 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493058 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493058 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/17 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/17556 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/27] | B41J2/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1992/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für die Tintenversorgung eines Tintenstrahldruckers | [1992/27] | English: | Method and apparatus for supplying ink to an ink jet printer | [1992/27] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'alimentation en encre d'une imprimante à jet d'encre | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 06.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3640032 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE2459744 (FACIT AB); | [A]DE2459745 (FACIT AB); | [A]EP0381392 (CANON KK [JP]) |