EP0493957 - Apparatus for improving antifuse programming yield and reducing antifuse programming time [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACTEL CORPORATION 955 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states ACTEL CORPORATION 955 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galbraith, Douglas C. 405 Rancho Arroyo Parkway 261 Fremont, California 94536 / US | 02 /
Chiang, Steve S. 19937 Scotland Drive Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 03 /
Eltoukhy, Abdelshafy A. 509 Churchill Park Drive San Jose, California / US | 04 /
Hamdy, Esmat Z. 4486 Ariel Avenue Fremont, California 94555 / US | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1992/28] | Williams, Trevor John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311941.8 | 23.12.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | US19910638517 | 04.01.1991 Original published format: US 638517 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0493957 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493957 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11C17/16, H01L27/04 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
G11C17/16 (EP,US);
H01L23/5252 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/28] | Title | German: | Apparat zur Verbesserung des Gegensicherungs-Programmierertrags und zur Reduktion der Gegensicherungs-Programmierzeit | [1992/28] | English: | Apparatus for improving antifuse programming yield and reducing antifuse programming time | [1992/28] | French: | Appareil pour améliorer le rendement de la programmation des anti-fusibles et pour réduire le temps de programmation des anti-fusibles | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.02.1997 | BE | 26.02.1997 | CH | 26.02.1997 | ES | 26.02.1997 | GR | 26.02.1997 | LI | 26.02.1997 | NL | 26.02.1997 | SE | 26.05.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
CH | 26.02.1997 | ||
ES | 26.02.1997 | ||
GR | 26.02.1997 | ||
LI | 26.02.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
CH | 26.02.1997 | ||
GR | 26.02.1997 | ||
LI | 26.02.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
CH | 26.02.1997 | ||
LI | 26.02.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
CH | 26.02.1997 | ||
LI | 26.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 26.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8503599 (NCR CO [US]); | [A]US4569121 (LIM SHELDON C P [US], et al); | [A]GB2222024 (STC PLC [GB]) |