EP0493085 - Graphics system for colour printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nickell, Eric S., c/o OMF Language Center Garcia Subdivision, Batangas City 4200 Batangas / PH | 02 /
Buckley, Robert R. 1864 Queensberry Road Pasadena CA 91104 / US | 03 /
Coleman, Robert M. 288A E. Howard Street Pasadena CA 91104 / US | 04 /
Rumph, David E. 1130 Leonard Avenue Pasadena CA 91107 / US | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Xerox Limited Patents Department Xerox Technical Centre Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts AL7 1HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1992/27] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311975.6 | 23.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | US19900632818 | 24.12.1990 Original published format: US 632818 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493085 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493085 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, G06K15/00, H04N1/46, G06F15/62 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G06K15/00 (EP,US);
G06K15/02 (EP,US);
G06K15/1822 (EP,US);
H04N1/465 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0014 (EP,US);
G06K2215/004 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/27] | G06F15/62, G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/27] | Title | German: | Grafiksystem für Farbdrucker | [1992/27] | English: | Graphics system for colour printing | [1992/27] | French: | Système graphique pour l'impression à couleur | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 06.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO8903065 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US4963898 (KADOWAKI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US4949188 (SATO YUICHI [JP]) |