EP0493120 - Isocyanate-reactive compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1992/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verhelst, Gabriel Mechelsesteenweg 667 B-3020 Herent / BE | 02 /
Cornet, Philip Warrandelaan 26 B-3090 Overijse / BE | 03 /
Fraeys de Veubeke, Benoit A. Chaussée de Louvain 59 B-1320 Hamme-Mille / BE | 04 /
Bleys, Geert Bremstraat 19 B-3001 Heverlee / BE | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H., et al Intellectual Property Department Huntsman Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H., et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 B-3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 91312036.6 | 24.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | GB19900028096 | 27.12.1990 Original published format: GB 9028096 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0493120 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/40 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
C08G18/4009 (EP,US);
C08G18/4804 (EP,US);
C08G2130/00 (EP,US);
Y10S516/04 (EP,US);
Y10S516/05 (EP,US);
Y10S516/06 (EP,US);
Y10S516/07 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | Gegenüber Isocyanaten reaktive Zusammensetzungen | [1992/27] | English: | Isocyanate-reactive compositions | [1992/27] | French: | Compositions réagissant avec des polyisocyanates | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/38] | 23.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3489698 (MOREHOUSE EDWARD L); | [A]US4273884 (DOMINGUEZ RICHARD J G); | [A]EP0039162 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) |