EP0493130 - Image encoding apparatus optimizing the amount of generated code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/27] | Image processing apparatus | ||
[1997/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enari, Masahiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hoshi, Nobuhiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takizawa, Hiroshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91312057.2 | 27.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | JP19900408947 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40894790 | JP19910082401 | 15.04.1991 Original published format: JP 8240191 | JP19910082402 | 15.04.1991 Original published format: JP 8240291 | JP19910085386 | 17.04.1991 Original published format: JP 8538691 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493130 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493130 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493130 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/41, H04N7/30, G06T9/00 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/15 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/593 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/45] | H04N1/41, H04N7/133 | ||
Former IPC [1992/27] | H04N1/41 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/27] | Title | German: | Bildcodierungsgerät mit Optimierung der erzeugten Codemenge | [1997/24] | English: | Image encoding apparatus optimizing the amount of generated code | [1997/24] | French: | Appareil pour codage d'images optimisant la quantité du code généré | [1997/24] |
Former [1992/27] | Bildverarbeitungsgerät | ||
Former [1992/27] | Image processing apparatus | ||
Former [1992/27] | Appareil de traitement d'images | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/24: (deleted) | EPB 1997/24: (deleted) | EPB 1997/24: (deleted) | EPB 1997/03: Teilanmeldung 96203076.3 eingereicht am 05/11/96 | EPB 1997/03: Divisional application 96203076.3 filed on 05/11/96 | EPB 1997/03: Demande divisionnaire 96203076.3 déposée le 05/11/96 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 10.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96203076.3 / EP0763925 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Request for further processing for: | 28.12.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.01.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US4984076 (WATANABE TOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0267579 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US4922273 (YONEKAWA HISASHI [JP], et al); | [AP]US4982282 (SAITO OSAMU [JP], et al) | Examination | EP0469852 | EP0447247 | EP0469835 | - IEEE Transactions On Communications Vol. COM-32, No. 3, March 1984, pp. 280-287, "An Interframe Coding System for Video Teleconferencing Signal Transmission at a 1.5 Mbit/s Rate". |