EP0440517 - Navigational system of a floating structure type allowing the exploration of the submarine environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gastaud, Paul-Louis 39, avenue Paul Doumer F-75116 Paris / FR | [1991/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/31] |
Former [1991/32] | Tanguy, Gilbert André SOCIETE INTERNATIONALE 19, rue de la Paix F-75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400114.4 | 18.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | FR19900001220 | 02.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9001220 | [1991/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440517 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B63C11/46, B63G8/00 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
B63C11/36 (EP);
B63C11/49 (EP);
B63B1/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | Navigationssystem mit einem schwimmenden Körper zur Erforschung des Unterwassermilieus | [1991/32] | English: | Navigational system of a floating structure type allowing the exploration of the submarine environment | [1991/32] | French: | Système de navigation du type à structure flottante permettant l'exploration du milieu sous-marin | [1991/32] | File destroyed: | 17.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/42] | 20.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4276851 ; | [AD]FR2606359 ; | [AD]WO8502157 ; | [AD]GB2046673 | [AD] - MARINE ENGINEERS REVIEW (MER), November 1986, page 45, LondonGB; "A mini-sub with many uses" |