EP0442786 - Transformation process of thermoplastic polyurethanes by extrusion and modifying agents used in this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piard, André Hameau de Champeaux F-27300 Bernay / FR | 02 /
Alex, Patrick 2, Villa des Pommiers F-91470 Limours Pecquese / FR | [1991/34] | Application number, filing date | 91400298.5 | 07.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | FR19900001691 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9001691 | [1991/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442786 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442786 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L75/04, // (C08L75/04, 77:00) | [1991/34] | CPC: |
C08L75/04 (EP,KR);
B29C48/022 (KR);
C08G69/40 (KR);
C08L77/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L75/04, C08L2666/18 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08L77/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Modifizierung von thermoplastischen Polyurethanen mittels Extrusion sowie in diesem Verfahren verwendete Modifizierungsmittel | [1991/34] | English: | Transformation process of thermoplastic polyurethanes by extrusion and modifying agents used in this process | [1991/34] | French: | Procédé de transformation des TPU par extrusion agents modifiants utilises selon ce procédé | [1991/34] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Request for further processing for: | 20.09.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.1995 | GR | 06.09.1995 | SE | 06.12.1995 | [2000/05] |
Former [1996/28] | AT | 06.09.1995 | |
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 06.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0012413 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]FR2575167 (INVENTA AG [CH]); | [X]EP0197845 (ATOCHEM [FR]); | [A]EP0334186 (BAYER AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0361712 |