EP0449674 - Miniature tactile effect switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEXTANT Avionique Immeuble le Galilée, Parc Tertiaire de Meudon, 5/7 rue Jeanne Braconnier 92366 Meudon la Forêt Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states SEXTANT AVIONIQUE Immeuble le Galilée, Parc Tertiaire de Meudon, 5/7 rue Jeanne Braconnier F-92366 Meudon la Forêt Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bedoya, Claude 6, Allée de l'Ivraie F-78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie, et al Cabinet Moutard 35 Rue de la Paroisse B.P. 20513 78005 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie, et al CABINET MOUTARD 35, Avenue Victor Hugo F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | ||
Former [1991/40] | Marquer, Francis Cabinet Moutard 35, Avenue Victor Hugo F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400376.9 | 14.02.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | FR19900004065 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: FR 9004065 | [1991/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0449674 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449674 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
H01H13/7006 (EP,US);
H01H13/703 (EP,US);
H01H2207/014 (EP,US);
H01H2211/028 (EP,US);
H01H2215/002 (EP,US);
H01H2217/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/40] | Title | German: | Miniaturschalter mit Berührungseffekt | [1991/40] | English: | Miniature tactile effect switch | [1991/40] | French: | Dispositif interrupteur miniature a effet tactile | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4083100 (FLINT JOHN E, et al); | [AD]EP0100875 (PREH ELEKTRO FEINMECHANIK [DE]); | [AD]US4468542 (POUNDS WALTER R [US]) |