EP0443952 - Sliding door, especially for railway carriages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAIVELEY TRANSPORT 143 Boulevard Anatole France, Carrefour Pleyel 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states FAIVELEY TRANSPORT 143 Boulevard Anatole France, Carrefour Pleyel 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states FAIVELEY TRANSPORT 143 Boulevard Anatole France, Carrefour Pleyel F-93200 Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morvan, Jean-Jacques 14 Allée des Fauvettes F-37270 Montlouis-Sur-Loire / FR | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Derambure, Christian, et al BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Derambure, Christian, et al Cabinet Bouju Derambure Bugnion 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/12] | Keib, Gérard Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52 rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/35] | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 F-75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400456.9 | 20.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | FR19900002256 | 23.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9002256 | [1991/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0443952 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0443952 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0443952 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B61D19/02, B61D19/00 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
B61D19/02 (EP,US);
B61D19/008 (EP,US);
E05D2015/1031 (EP,US);
E05D2015/1055 (EP,US);
E05D2015/1086 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/35] | Title | German: | Schiebetür, insbesondere für Eisenbahnwagen | [1991/35] | English: | Sliding door, especially for railway carriages | [1991/35] | French: | Porte à vantail coulissant, en particulier pour véhicule ferroviaire | [1991/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1994
18.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE IFE Industrie-Einrichtungen Fertigungs-Aktiengesellschaft Patertal 20 A-3340 Waidhofen a.d. Ybbs / AT Opponent's representative Barger, Werner Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner Operngasse 4 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1994
18.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE IFE Industrie-Einrichtungen Fertigungs-Aktiengesellschaft Patertal 20 A-3340 Waidhofen a.d. Ybbs / AT Opponent's representative Barger, Werner Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner Mahlerstrasse 9 Postfach 96 1015 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1994/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1994
18.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE IFE Industrie-Einrichtungen Fertigungs-Aktiengesellschaft Patertal 20 A-3340 Waidhofen a.d. Ybbs / AT Opponent's representative Barger, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner Biberstrasse 15 A-1010 Wien / AT | 18.08.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.12.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 20.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.09.1997 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.09.1997 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.04.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.1993 | CH | 28.02.1994 | LI | 28.02.1994 | [1995/02] |
Former [1994/32] | AT | 13.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT374151B (SIMMERING GRAZ PAUKER AG [AT]); | [A]EP0196488 (BODE & CO GEB); | [A]EP0320591 (BODE & CO GEB [DE]) | by applicant | FR2621879 | Opposition | FR2621879 |