EP0445006 - Heat exchanger with circular flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LONG MANUFACTURING LTD. 656 Kerr Street Oakville Ontario L6K 3E4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states LONG MANUFACTURING LTD. 656 Kerr Street Oakville Ontario L6K 3E4 / CA | ||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states VALEO ENGINE COOLING, INC. 1111 Allen Street Jamestown, New York 14701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beatenbough, Paul Kenneth 4909 Salt Works Road Medina, New York 14103 / US | 02 /
Meekins, Kris J. 34 Maple Street Bemus Point, New York 14712 / US | 03 /
Stohl, Clark E. 4001 Cowing Road Lakewood, New York 14750 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Picard, Jean-Claude Georges Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | Picard, Jean-Claude Georges Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/36] | Lemaire, Marc Valeo Management Services, Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400482.5 | 22.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | US19900484252 | 26.02.1990 Original published format: US 484252 | [1991/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445006 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445006 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
F28D9/0012 (EP);
F28D9/0031 (EP);
F28D9/0043 (EP);
F28D9/0056 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher mit kreisförmiger Strömung | [1991/36] | English: | Heat exchanger with circular flow | [1991/36] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur à écoulement circulaire | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 11.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0208957 ; | [A]US1669062 ; | [A]US3743011 ; | [A]US4836276 ; | [A]DE2109346 |