EP0453341 - Casing for interfacing between a lock of the vehicle, its actuator and the lead bundle of the vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROCKWELL BODY AND CHASSIS SYSTEMS - FRANCE, en abrégé: ROCKWELL BCS - FRANCE Tour Gan - Cédex 13 92082 Paris La Défense 2 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states ROCKWELL BODY AND CHASSIS SYSTEMS - FRANCE, en abrégé: ROCKWELL BCS - FRANCE Tour Gan - Cédex 13 F-92082 Paris La Défense 2 / FR | ||
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states ROCKWELL AUTOMOTIVE BODY SYSTEMS-FRANCE EN ABREGE:ROCKWELL ABS-FRANCE Tour Gan Cédex 13 F-92082 Paris La Defense 2 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Periou, Pierre 15, rue des Boccages Bruns F-95000 Cergy Pontoise / FR | 02 /
Grandjean, Richard 324, chemin du Foing-St-Margurerite F-88100 St.Die / FR | 03 /
Laurent, Bruno 23, Cedarhurst-Park Road B913SV Solihull, West Midlands / GB | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Martin, Jean-Paul, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400831.3 | 27.03.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | FR19900004330 | 04.04.1990 Original published format: FR 9004330 | [1991/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453341 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453341 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/00 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
E05B81/06 (EP);
E05B81/16 (EP);
E05B81/54 (EP);
E05B63/0056 (EP);
E05B83/36 (EP);
E05B85/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | Gehäuse zur Verbindung zwischen einem Kraftfahrzeugschloss, seiner Betätigung und dem Leiterbündel des Fahrzeuges | [1991/43] | English: | Casing for interfacing between a lock of the vehicle, its actuator and the lead bundle of the vehicle | [1991/43] | French: | Boîtier d'interface entre une serrure de véhicule automobile, son actionneur et le faisceau de connexions électriques du véhicule | [1991/43] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.05.1995 | IT | 31.05.1995 | SE | 31.08.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 31.05.1995 | |
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 31.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2911681 ; | [A]DE3526501 ; | [A]EP0359606 ; | [A]US4653841 |