EP0452188 - Monitoring and imaging device with matrix sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1996 [1996/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem SA 6, place d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states SOCIETE D'APPLICATIONS GENERALES D'ELECTRICITE ET DE MECANIQUE SAGEM 6, Avenue d'Iéna F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metivier, Philippe 13, rue Saint Exupéry F-78300 Poissy / FR | 02 /
Encaoua, Serge 65, rue Martre F-92110 Clichy / FR | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91400868.5 | 29.03.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | FR19900004181 | 02.04.1990 Original published format: FR 9004181 | [1991/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0452188 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0452188 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/08 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
H04N3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1991/42] | Title | German: | Abbildungs- und Überwachungsvorrichtung mit Matrixsensor | [1991/42] | English: | Monitoring and imaging device with matrix sensor | [1991/42] | French: | Dispositif d'imagerie et de surveillance à détecteur matriciel | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 01.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0298606 ; | [A]GB2180719 |