EP0457652 - Use of embedded anchoring elements for insulating slabs, in particular for slabs made of rock wool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/47] | Embedded anchoring elements for insulating slabs, in particular for slabs made of rock wool | ||
[1994/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1991/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tillessen, Rudolf Brunnenpfad 2 W-6800 Mannheim 51 / DE | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Ménès, Catherine, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Menes, Catherine, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401192.9 | 07.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | DE19900005635U | 17.05.1990 Original published format: DE 9005635 U | [1991/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457652 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457652 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/36, E04B9/28, E04F13/08 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
E04B5/36 (EP);
E04B1/80 (EP);
E04F13/0823 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/47] | Title | German: | Verwendung von eingebetteten Verankerungselementen für Dämmplatten, insbesondere für Mineralwolleplatten | [1994/30] | English: | Use of embedded anchoring elements for insulating slabs, in particular for slabs made of rock wool | [1994/30] | French: | Utilisation d'éléments d'ancrage pour des plaques isolantes en particulier des plaques en laine minérale | [1994/30] |
Former [1991/47] | Eingemauerte Verankerungselemente für Dämmplatte, insbesondere für Steinwolleplatte | ||
Former [1991/47] | Embedded anchoring elements for insulating slabs, in particular for slabs made of rock wool | ||
Former [1991/47] | Eléments d'ancrage à scellement pour des plaques isolantes en particulier des plaques en laine minérale | Examination procedure | 22.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 04.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 28.09.1993 | Appeal received | 19.11.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.12.1993 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3359701 ; | [A]LU82372 ; | [A]US2326506 ; | [A]FR2437519 ; | [A]FR2226519 ; | [A]FR2480827 |