EP0460985 - Device for monitoring the closure of car doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROCKWELL BODY AND CHASSIS SYSTEMS - FRANCE, en abrégé: ROCKWELL BCS - FRANCE Tour Gan - Cédex 13 92082 Paris La Défense 2 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states ROCKWELL BODY AND CHASSIS SYSTEMS - FRANCE, en abrégé: ROCKWELL BCS - FRANCE Tour Gan - Cédex 13 F-92082 Paris La Défense 2 / FR | ||
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states ROCKWELL AUTOMOTIVE BODY SYSTEMS-FRANCE EN ABREGE:ROCKWELL ABS-FRANCE Tour Gan Cédex 13 F-92082 Paris La Defense 2 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Periou, Pierre 15, les Boccages Bruns F-95000 Cergy Pontoise / FR | [1991/50] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1991/50] | Tilliet, René Raymond Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401287.7 | 17.05.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | FR19900006936 | 05.06.1990 Original published format: FR 9006936 | [1991/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0460985 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0460985 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/36, E05B47/00 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
E05B77/48 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5978 (EP,US);
Y10T70/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1991/50] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Überwachung des Verschlusses der Türen eines Autos | [1991/50] | English: | Device for monitoring the closure of car doors | [1991/50] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance de la fermeture des ouvrants d'un véhicule automobile | [1991/50] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/29] | 23.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2923505 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) | Examination | US4574268 |