EP0463925 - Construction method adjacent to mountain side, of a semi-buried structure and thus realized structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matière, Marcel 17, avenue Aristide Briand F-15000 Aurillac / FR | [1992/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401620.9 | 17.06.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | FR19900007877 | 22.06.1990 Original published format: FR 9007877 | [1992/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463925 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463925 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E01F7/04, E04B7/08 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
E04B7/08 (EP,US);
E01F7/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines halbunterirdischen Bauwerks an einem Bergabhang und auf diese Weise hergestelltes Bauwerk | [1992/01] | English: | Construction method adjacent to mountain side, of a semi-buried structure and thus realized structure | [1992/01] | French: | Procédé de réalisation, à flanc de montagne, d'une structure semi-enterrée et structure ainsi réalisée | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 23.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.1996
07.06.1996
ADMISSIBLE SOGEA S.A. 3, cours Ferdinand de Lesseps 92851 RUEIL-MALMAISON / FR Opponent's representative Derambure, Christian BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.1996
07.06.1996
ADMISSIBLE SOGEA S.A. 3, cours Ferdinand de Lesseps 92851 RUEIL-MALMAISON / FR Opponent's representative Derambure, Christian BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | 10.07.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.02.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.06.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.08.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.04.1999 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1999/31] | Appeal following opposition | 12.10.1998 | Appeal received No. T1010/98 | 14.12.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.04.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 23.08.1995 | GB | 23.08.1995 | GR | 23.08.1995 | NL | 23.08.1995 | SE | 23.11.1995 | DE | 24.11.1995 | BE | 30.06.1996 | LU | 30.06.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/05] | DK | 23.08.1995 | |
GB | 23.08.1995 | ||
GR | 23.08.1995 | ||
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
DE | 24.11.1995 | ||
BE | 30.06.1996 | ||
LU | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 23.08.1995 | |
GB | 23.08.1995 | ||
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
DE | 24.11.1995 | ||
BE | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | GB | 23.08.1995 | |
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
DE | 24.11.1995 | ||
BE | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | GB | 23.08.1995 | |
SE | 23.11.1995 | ||
DE | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | SE | 23.11.1995 | |
DE | 24.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR510802 (PERRET FRERES); | [AD]CH402919 (SARRASIN ALEXANDRE [CH], et al); | [AD]US3282056 (FISHER CHRISTOPHER L); | [A]EP0277399 (NIHON SAMICON COMPANY LIMITED [JP]) | [AD] - STRASSE UND VERKEHR/ROUTE ET TRAFIC. no. 6, 2 Juin 1967, ZURICH CH pages 260 - 261; CH.CLEUSIX: 'route de la Forclaz ' | [A] - STRASSE UND VERKEHR/ROUTE ET TRAFIC. no. 3, 11 Mars 1974, ZURICH CH pages 109 - 113; E.STUCKI ET AL: 'Steinschlaggalerie Güetli ' |