EP0463966 - High-performance multi-processor having floating point unit and operation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/01] | High-performance multi-processor having floating point unit | ||
[1998/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard Massachusetts 01745 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, Massachusetts 01745 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jain, Anil 158 Kirkland Drive Stow, Massachusetts 01775 / US | 02 /
Wolrich, Gilbert Four Cidermill Mill Road Framingham, Massachusetts 01701 / US | 03 /
Deverell, David 182 Arcade Avenue Seekonk, Massachusetts 02771 / US | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/01] | Mongrédien, André c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401733.0 | 26.06.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | US19900547603 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: US 547603 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0463966 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0463966 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463966 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F7/48 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
G06F7/483 (EP,US);
G06F9/30014 (EP,US);
G06F9/30145 (EP,US);
G06F9/3016 (EP,US);
G06F9/30167 (EP,US);
G06F9/3802 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (EP,US);
G06F9/3838 (EP,US);
G06F9/3844 (EP,US);
G06F9/3854 (EP,US);
G06F9/3856 (EP,US);
G06F9/3858 (EP,US);
G06F9/3861 (EP,US);
G06F9/3867 (EP,US);
G06F9/3877 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/01] | G06F9/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/01] | Title | German: | Hochleistungsfähiger Multiprozessor mit Gleitkommaeinheit und Verfahren zu seinem Betrieb | [1998/48] | English: | High-performance multi-processor having floating point unit and operation method | [1998/48] | French: | Multiprocesseur à haute performance ayant unité à virgule flottante et méthode de fonctionnement | [1998/48] |
Former [1992/01] | Hochleistungsfähiger Multiprozessor mit Gleitkommaeinheit | ||
Former [1992/01] | High-performance multi-processor having floating point unit | ||
Former [1992/01] | Multiprocesseur à haute performance ayant unité à virgule flottante | Examination procedure | 10.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61183740 ; | [X]US4179734 (O'LEARY GEORGE P [US]); | [A]US4295203 (JOYCE THOMAS F); | [A]EP0365322 (APOLLO COMPUTER [US]) |