EP0468847 - Rapid ultrasonic extracorporal hyperthermia apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDAP INTERNATIONAL Z.I. le Parc aux Vignes Rue des Vieilles Vignes F-77200 Croissy Beaubourg-Marne la Vallée / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states EDAP INTERNATIONAL Z.I. le Parc aux Vignes Rue des Vieilles Vignes F-77200 Croissy Beaubourg-Marne la Vallée / FR | ||
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states EDAP INTERNATIONAL Z.I. le Parc aux Vignes Rue des Vieilles Vignes F-77200 Croissy Beaubourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dory, Jacques 91, rue des Molveaux F-77450 Coupvray / FR | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/48] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie CABINET MOUTARD 35, Avenue Victor Hugo F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | ||
Former [1992/05] | Marquer, Francis Cabinet Moutard 35, Avenue Victor Hugo F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401936.9 | 01.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | FR19900009717 | 23.07.1990 Original published format: FR 9009717 | [1992/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468847 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468847 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/00 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
A61N7/02 (EP);
A61B2017/00154 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | Schnelles, extrakorporales Ultraschallhyperthermiegerät | [1992/05] | English: | Rapid ultrasonic extracorporal hyperthermia apparatus | [1992/05] | French: | Appareil d'hyperthermie ultrasonore extracorporelle ultrarapide | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 24.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Request for further processing for: | 04.01.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.10.1996 | GR | 16.10.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | GR | 16.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB820814 (UNIV ILLINOIS); | [X]US3735755 (EGGLETON R, et al); | [A]EP0045265 (DORY JACQUES); | [A]EP0162735 (DORY JACQUES); | [A]EP0339693 (DORY JACQUES); | [X]EP0370841 (EDAP INT [FR]) |