EP0468882 - Liquid crystal compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.1996 [1996/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Shell Sekiyu Kabushiki Kaisha 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isozaki, Tadaaki, c/o SHOWA SHELL SEKIYU K.K. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
Mogamiya, Hiroyuki, c/o SHOWA SHELL SEKIYU K.K. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 03 /
Sakuma, Shigenori, c/o SHOWA SHELL SEKIYU K.K. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 04 /
Yamakawa, Noriko, c/o SHOWA SHELL SEKIYU K.K. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Bourgognon, Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Bourgognon, Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402053.2 | 24.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | JP19900198500 | 26.07.1990 Original published format: JP 19850090 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468882 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468882 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/88, C09K19/20 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
C07C69/90 (EP);
C09K19/0266 (EP);
C09K19/2021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/05] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallverbindung | [1992/05] | English: | Liquid crystal compound | [1992/05] | French: | Composé cristal liquide | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 31.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63307837 ; | [Y]EP0350330 | [Y] - MOLECULAR CRYSTALS AND LIQUID CRYSTALS INCORPORATING NONLINEAR OPTICS, vol. 174, Sepember 1989, pages 89-99, Gordon and Breach Science Publishers S.A., New York, US; G. GALLI et al.: "The mesomorphic behaviour of bisalkyl 4,4'-(terephthaloyldioxy)dibenzoates as models of thermotropic polyesters" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 151 (C-584)[3499], 12th April 1989, page 26 C 584; & JP-A-63 307 837 (DAICEL CHEM. IND. LTD) 15-12-1988, & JP63307837 A 00000000 |